U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Clary v. Salmonsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Mail Returned]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - IRS Summons]
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 21, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.