U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Swisher v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 07, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • September 29, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • September 09, 2021: [Vacate]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • September 03, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • August 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • August 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 18, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 04, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • July 26, 2021: [Errata - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 21, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.