U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00081
  • Case Name: Ohio Security Insurance Company v. The Center for Asbestos Related Disease, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Strike - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2022
  • February 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Response to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 27, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 27, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 19, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 22, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 22, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.