U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00082
  • Case Name: Wilderness Watch et al v. Marten et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 31, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2021: [Vacate]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 24, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 22, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 22, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.