U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lanius-McLeod et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 26, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 08, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 07, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 25, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 25, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 23, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Petition to Open Juvenile/Sealed Records and Order - MT]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 03, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 13, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 10, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 06, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 27, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 12, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 06, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 02, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • July 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 26, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.