U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 16, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 03, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 02, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 23, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 23, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.