U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dontmix
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 10, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 10, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 10, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 28, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Vacate]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • September 23, 2021: [Letter - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 21, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 13, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • August 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 23, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 23, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.