U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Calendrillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 17, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 17, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • August 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 24, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 14, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 10, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 23, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 23, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.