U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leikam
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 21, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 21, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 03, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 02, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.