U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Barnard of Nevada v. Ace World Companies, LTD. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • January 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • October 04, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 01, 2021: [Counterclaim]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Proof of Service - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 23, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 23, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.