U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:07-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Drost
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 09, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • September 02, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.