U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mallak
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [821 Remark-MT]
  • May 13, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment (782/821)]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 13, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 13, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 01, 2022: [Dismiss ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 17, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 15, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • February 11, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 20, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 23, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 23, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.