U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00009
  • Case Name: McMurray v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Social Security Reply Brief - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 01, 2021: [Administrative Correction - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Social Security Reply Brief - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 06, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Remark]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.