U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Hane v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Response to Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Remark]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.