U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00084
  • Case Name: Alliance for the Wild Rockies et al v. United States Forest Service et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • December 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 23, 2022: [Appear]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 26, 2022: [Appear]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Amicus Brief - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief ]
  • March 17, 2022: [File Amicus Brief ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief ]
  • March 08, 2022: [File Amicus Brief ]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • December 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Case Management Order - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 26, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • July 26, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.