U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00083
  • Case Name: Garwood v. Geissel et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 04, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Joinder - MT]
  • September 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 18, 2022: [Joinder in Motion - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [In Limine]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 02, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Lodged Sealed Document - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • November 01, 2021: [Appear]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 03, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 01, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • October 01, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 21, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • July 26, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 26, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 26, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.