U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Miller v. Winner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Compel]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • December 01, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 31, 2022: [Proof of Service - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 15, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • July 26, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • July 26, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.