U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00085
  • Case Name: Thurston v. Walmart Stores, Inc., Store No. 7199 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • August 31, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 25, 2021: [Remark]
  • August 25, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 25, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.