U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Landwehr
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.