U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00086
  • Case Name: Running Crane v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • December 02, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Certificate of Appealability - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
September, 2022
  • September 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Appear]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 02, 2022: [Vacate]
February, 2022
  • February 21, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • February 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 07, 2021: [Crossclaim]
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 23, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 22, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 02, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 27, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 27, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.