U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Elansari v. State of Montana et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [USCA Mandate - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 26, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Reconsideration]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 15, 2021: [Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-Mail - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-Mail - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-Mail - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 27, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.