U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00056
  • Case Name: Harrison v. Bludworth et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 11, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.