U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Widdicombe v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 07, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Social Security Opening Brief]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Social Security Reply Brief - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Administrative Record]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.