U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00008
  • Case Name: Curtiss v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Social Security Opening Brief]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Social Security Reply Brief - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Remark]
  • July 26, 2021: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.