U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Tri-County Mechanical and Electrical, Inc. v. Local Union 41 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Undeliverable Electronic Notice - MT]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 28, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 28, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 28, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.