U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00081
  • Case Name: Rod v. BNSF Railway Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Staying Case]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • October 14, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 28, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.