U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:91-cv-00078
  • Case Name: Wilderness Society, et al v. Dombeck, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Mail Returned]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 19, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 02, 2021: [Mail Returned]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 27, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • August 19, 2021: [Mail Returned]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.