U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00087
  • Case Name: King v. United Teacher Associates Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 09, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • April 26, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 25, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Joinder - MT]
  • March 10, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • March 10, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 10, 2025: [In Limine]
January, 2025
  • January 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 14, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • January 04, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2025: [Response to Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: [Protective Order]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2024: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • October 04, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 12, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 07, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 15, 2021: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 07, 2021: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 23, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Entry of Default]
  • August 18, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 12, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 03, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 02, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • August 02, 2021: [Remark]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.