U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 20, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 20, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 17, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • December 29, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 30, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 30, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 30, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 05, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 16, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 29, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.