U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gendreau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 11, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • August 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 11, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 10, 2022: [Protective Order ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 21, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 21, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 21, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 03, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 20, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 29, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.