U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 30, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 30, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 30, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 27, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 27, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 10, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 16, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 19, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 29, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.