U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Van Pelt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • April 11, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • April 11, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 01, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Dismissal of Counts by Court - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 28, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 05, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • December 03, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • December 03, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 02, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Suppress ]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 29, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.