U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cockerham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 03, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 03, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 14, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 27, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 29, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.