U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wood
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 25, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 25, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 25, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 15, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 29, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.