U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Humble
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 25, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 25, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 07, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 04, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 27, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 29, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.