U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Defrance
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 09, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 05, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Vacate]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • July 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 01, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion) - MT]
  • July 01, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 31, 2022: [Telephone Conference ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • March 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 04, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 18, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 20, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • October 08, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion) - MT]
  • October 08, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2021: [Response to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 17, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 03, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [In Limine ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 03, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 26, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 26, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • August 26, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 18, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 18, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 13, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 02, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 29, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.