U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weber
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [U.S. Supreme Court Document]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Transcript - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 18, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 18, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 24, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 20, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Jury Verdict - Unredacted - SDM]
  • July 13, 2022: [Jury Verdict - Redacted -MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Witness List - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion) - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • July 11, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Jury List ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion) - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • July 03, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • July 01, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • July 01, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • July 01, 2022: [Witness List - SDM]
  • July 01, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • July 01, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • July 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearing - SDM]
  • June 28, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • June 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion) - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 29, 2021: [Dismissal of Counts by Court - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 28, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 27, 2021: [In Limine ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Suppress ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 27, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Return of Service of Subpoena - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Order - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [In Limine ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 13, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Amend/Correct ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [Stipulation - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • August 31, 2021: [Appear]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Revoke]
  • August 25, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Transcript Designation Order Form - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • August 03, 2021: [Appear]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 29, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.