U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Golie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 17, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • April 17, 2025: [Supplement - MT]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery ]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Discovery ]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • February 03, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Mail Returned - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [USCA Order]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Alter Judgment ]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 24, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 24, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • March 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Stipulation - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 02, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 21, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 29, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.