U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-cv-00173
  • Case Name: Friends of the Wild Swan et al v. Haaland et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Approve Settlement Agreement - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Stay]
  • November 30, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Approve Settlement Agreement - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Case Management Order - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • September 13, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.