U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05112-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Wilcox
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Forfeiture of Collateral]
  • October 07, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
  • October 01, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Order - MTD]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • July 29, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.