U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Yellowbear v. Salmonsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 24, 2021: [Change Venue]
  • November 15, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 12, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 30, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 30, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.