U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. U.S. Minerals, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 10, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 24, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 09, 2021: [Appear]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 06, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 06, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summons]
  • August 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 02, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Summons]
  • August 02, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.