U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00087
  • Case Name: Sankara v. Merrick Bank Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 14, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 18, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • December 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 03, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • December 03, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • November 24, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 11, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 01, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 01, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Dismissing Parties - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 24, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 09, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 02, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.