U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Fenech et al v. Hogan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Remark]
  • December 15, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 11, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 10, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 01, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 07, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 03, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 03, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.