U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Talley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 03, 2021: [Expedite ]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 10, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.