U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00088
  • Case Name: Cole et al v. Montana University System et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 20, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 20, 2023: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 06, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 24, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • September 01, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 26, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 25, 2022: [Certify Class - SDM]
  • March 25, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 21, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order]
  • December 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 28, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • December 23, 2021: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • December 02, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • December 01, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 24, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 24, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2021: [Response to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 18, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • August 04, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 04, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • August 04, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.