U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Friedt v. State of Montana
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [USCA Mandate - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 02, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • August 06, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.