U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:18-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brendal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 10, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.