U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00022
  • Case Name: Standley v. Devera et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Strike - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Compel]
  • August 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • August 05, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • August 05, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 05, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Stay]
  • July 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 10, 2022: [Status Report]
  • June 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 03, 2022: [Compel]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Status Report]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice and Warning to Pro Se Prisoner - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 16, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 17, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • August 19, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 19, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.