U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.